CT SB00012 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - House Calendar Number 498
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-04 - House Calendar Number 498
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To distinguish short-term health insurance policies from those having a duration of one year or more for the purpose of the Insurance Commissioner's approval of rescinding, cancelling or limiting a policy, to limit the scope of an investigation into a suspected preexisting condition and to specify requirements for insurers or health care centers that accept telephonic applications for individual health insurance coverage.
Title
An Act Clarifying Postclaims Underwriting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 298 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | House Calendar Number 498 | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-03 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4348 | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-13 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-03-03 | File Number 1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Calendar Number 35 | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-02-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-02-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-02-05 | Public Hearing 02/11 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |