CT SB00011 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - File Number 712
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - File Number 712
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements, Transportation And Other Purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | File Number 712 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 506 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/16 10:00 AM |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |