CT SB00010 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 623
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Adjustments To State Revenue And Concerning The Ambulatory Surgical Centers Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateFile Number 623
2018-04-23SenateSenate Calendar Number 384
2018-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-16SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM
2018-04-06SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-05SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing 03/02
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback