CT SB00009 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-7-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To equalize access to physical, mental and behavioral health care in the state and to strengthen the state's response to the fentanyl and opioid epidemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Health And Wellness For Connecticut Residents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 362 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 244 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 262 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 41 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-28SenateSigned by the Governor
2023-06-15SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2023-06-15SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2023-06-12SenatePublic Act 23-97
2023-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2023-06-05SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2023-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
2023-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2023-06-02HouseDisagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
2023-06-02SenateImmediate Transmittal to the Senate
2023-06-02SenateHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2023-06-02HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
2023-06-02HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9444
2023-06-02HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C
2023-06-02HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-26HouseHouse Calendar Number 598
2023-05-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-05-25HouseRules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
2023-05-25SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,C
2023-05-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule C 8777
2023-05-25SenateAmendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule B 8759
2023-05-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8735
2023-05-09SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-05-09SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-09SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-05-08SenateJoint Favorable
2023-05-03SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2023-04-12SenateFile Number 507
2023-04-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 303
2023-04-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-04-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-27SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2023-03-17SenatePublic Hearing 03/22
2023-03-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health
2023-03-14SenateDrafted by Committee
2023-01-13SenateVote to Draft
2023-01-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00009&which_year=2023
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R00-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R01-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R02-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R03-SB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/ACT/PA/PDF/2023PA-00097-R00SB-00009-PA.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO08253-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO08661-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO08698-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO08697-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/S/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00SC-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/S/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00SB-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/S/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00SA-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO08639-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/lcoamd/pdf/2023LCO09244-R00-AMD.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/S/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-00009-R000507-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-00009-R000507-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00LCO08697-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00LCO08639-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00LCO08735-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00LCO08759-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00LCO08777-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-00009-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-00009-R01-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023SB-00009-R00LCO09444-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023SB-00009-R02-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023SB-00009-R02-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/SUM/PDF/2023SUM00097-R03SB-00009-SUM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R00PH-CV11-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R00PH-CV128-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/S/PDF/2023SB-00009-R00APP-CV164-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/S/PDF/2023SV-00262-R00SB00009-SV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/H/PDF/2023HV-00244-R00SB00009-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/S/PDF/2023SV-00362-R00SB00009-SV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback