CT SB00009 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-19 - Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to conduct a study regarding the reduction of all existing fees for initial occupational licenses, certifications and registrations by seventy-five per cent and the increasing of existing renewal fees for such licenses, certifications and registrations to account for lost revenue.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Regarding The Adjustment Of Fees For Occupational Licenses, Certifications And Registrations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |