CT SB00009 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-24 - Motion Failed SF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To enter Connecticut into the Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote, thereby committing the state's votes in the Electoral College to the presidential candidate that wins the popular vote nationally, regardless of whether such presidential candidate wins the popular vote within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Entering Connecticut Into The National Popular Vote Compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24SenateMotion Failed SF
2017-03-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2017-03-10SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-03-06SenateVote to Draft
2017-02-17SenatePublic Hearing 02/22
2017-01-27SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2017-01-04SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback