CT SB00006 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-13-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-13-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Establish (A) a framework for controlling and processing personal data, and (B) responsibilities and privacy protection standards for data controllers and processors; and (2) grant consumers the right to (A) access, correct, delete and obtain a copy of personal data, and (B) opt out of the processing of personal data for the purposes of (i) targeted advertising, (ii) certain sales of personal data, or (iii) profiling in furtherance of decisions that produce legal or similarly significant effects concerning consumers.
Title
An Act Concerning Personal Data Privacy And Online Monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 137 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-15 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 436 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4985 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-12 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-31 | Senate | File Number 238 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 189 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |