CT SB00004 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce carbon emissions by expanding public and private utilization of electric vehicles in Connecticut to protect human health and the environment.
Title
An Act Concerning The Connecticut Clean Air Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 153 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 52 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 53 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 174 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 177 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 154 HOUSE AMD B (Y: 53 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 155 AS AMENDED (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 174 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 176 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 177 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-25 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5959 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 5937 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-04-27 | Senate | House Calendar Number 486 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 5370 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 5470 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 5369 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 5461 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 5450 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 5426 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 5435 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5431 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-20 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-04-11 | Senate | File Number 406 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 278 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |