CT SB00003 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To grow the economy by supporting diverse economic opportunities, worker protections and small business revitalization.
Title
An Act Concerning Diverse Economic Opportunity, Worker Protections And Small Business Revitalization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 391 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 329 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 329 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Public Act 21-188 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 592 |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 9904 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 352 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 218 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |