CT SB00002 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-10-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To address pandemic impact on childhood depression, anxiety and developmental delays through the expansion of support services.
Title
An Act Expanding Preschool And Mental And Behavioral Services For Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 51 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 129 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 170 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act 22-81 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6390 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 469 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5219 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 276 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 207 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |