CT SB00002 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - File Number 207
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To provide more economic security to Connecticut families by increasing the minimum fair wage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Increasing The Minimum Fair Wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateFile Number 207
2019-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 125
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-18SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-14SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-01SenatePublic Hearing 03/07
2019-02-27SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
2019-02-26SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-15SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-09SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback