CT SB00001 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To preserve jobs and encourage job creation in Connecticut.
Title
An Act Concerning The Preservation And Creation Of Jobs In Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 4793 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 247 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4792 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3618 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 4793 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 247 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 4792 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 246 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 3618 (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-11 | Public Act 10-45 | |
2010-05-01 | In Concurrence | |
2010-05-01 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 4984 | |
2010-05-01 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-01 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-04-30 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 4793 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 4792 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 3618 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4808 | |
2010-04-19 | File Number 592 | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Calendar Number 423 | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-04-01 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2010-02-23 | Drafted by Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Vote to Draft | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |