CT HR00009 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Adopted, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The University Of Connecticut Board Of Trustees And The Graduate Employee Union Local 6950- International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace And Agricultural Implement Workers Of America (geu-uaw).
Title
Resolution Proposing Approval Of A Collective Bargaining Agreement Between The University Of Connecticut Board Of Trustees And The Graduate Employee Union Local 6950- International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace And Agricultural Implement Workers Of America (geu-uaw).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 73 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (House) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-26 | House | Rules Suspended |
2018-04-25 | House | File Number 645 |
2018-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 446 |
2018-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, House Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-18 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-17 | House | House Favorable |
2018-04-13 | House | Public Hearing 04/17 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-11 | House | Filed with House Clerks 04/09 |