CT HJ00372 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Nicholas Kapoor Of Monroe To Be A Member Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Nicholas Kapoor Of Monroe To Be A Member Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 232 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-05-20 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2021-05-13 | House | Senate Calendar Number 422 |
2021-05-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-11 | House | Adopted, House |
2021-05-07 | House | House Calendar Number 457 |
2021-05-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-07 | House | Public Hearing 04/27 |