CT HJ00368 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Bert J. Hunter Of Greenwich To Be A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Materials Innovation And Recycling Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Bert J. Hunter Of Greenwich To Be A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Materials Innovation And Recycling Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 153 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-05-12 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 356 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | Adopted, House |
2021-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 133 |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |