CT HJ00261 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Tabled for the Calendar, House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Proposing An Amendment To The State Constitution To Revise Requirements Relating To The Offering Of Bail Or Pretrial Release To Persons Accused Of A Crime.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Proposing An Amendment To The State Constitution To Revise Requirements Relating To The Offering Of Bail Or Pretrial Release To Persons Accused Of A Crime.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25HouseTabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-25HouseNo New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2023-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-25HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-25HouseJoint Favorable
2023-04-18HouseReferred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2023-04-12HouseFile Number 549
2023-04-12HouseHouse Calendar Number 344
2023-04-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-12HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-05HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-27HouseJoint Favorable
2023-03-17HousePublic Hearing 03/22
2023-03-16HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback