CT HJ00175 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - File Number 603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - File Number 603
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Granting An Extension Of Time To The Claims Commissioner For The Disposition Of Certain Claims.
Title
Resolution Granting An Extension Of Time To The Claims Commissioner For The Disposition Of Certain Claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | File Number 603 |
2021-04-26 | House | House Calendar Number 426 |
2021-04-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing 03/26 |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |