CT HJ00162 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Matt Fleury Of Hartford To Be Reappointed To The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Matt Fleury Of Hartford To Be Reappointed To The Board Of Regents For Higher Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 75 ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseIn Concurrence
2019-04-25HouseSenate Passed
2019-04-22HouseSenate Calendar Number 382
2019-04-22HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17HouseAdopted, House
2019-04-11HouseHouse Calendar Number 388
2019-04-11HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-11HousePublic Hearing 04/09

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback