CT HJ00161 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Proposing An Amendment To The State Constitution To Allow For Early Voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Proposing An Amendment To The State Constitution To Allow For Early Voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 86 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8194 (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 87 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8155 (Y: 13 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 88 PASS (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 64 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 65 APPEAL CHAIR HOUSE AMD B (Y: 90 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 66 AS AMENDED (Y: 125 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-05-08HouseIn Concurrence
2019-05-08HouseAdopted, Senate as Amended by House A
2019-05-08HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8155
2019-05-08HouseSenate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8194
2019-05-08HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26HouseFile Number 818
2019-04-26HouseSenate Calendar Number 429
2019-04-26HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-24HouseAdopted, House as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24HouseHouse Ruled House Amendment Not Germane, House Amendment Schedule B 7308
2019-04-24HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7493
2019-04-04HouseFile Number 436
2019-04-04HouseHouse Calendar Number 237
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-04HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-22HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-08HousePublic Hearing 03/13
2019-03-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HJ00161&which_year=2019
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HJ-00161-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TOB/h/pdf/2019HJ-00161-R01-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/ACT/ra/pdf/2019RA-00001-R00HJ-00161-RA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/TS/h/pdf/2019HJ-00161-R00GAE-CV18-TS.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00066-R00HJ00161-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00065-R00HJ00161-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/h/pdf/2019HV-00064-R00HJ00161-HV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00088-R00HJ00161-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00087-R00HJ00161-SV.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2019/VOTE/s/pdf/2019SV-00086-R00HJ00161-SV.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback