CT HJ00144 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Andrew Cascudo Of Hartford To Be Appointed A Member Of The State Elections Enforcement Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Andrew Cascudo Of Hartford To Be Appointed A Member Of The State Elections Enforcement Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 72 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2018-04-18SenateAdopted, Senate
2018-04-11SenateSenate Calendar Number 264
2018-04-11SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-10SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
2018-04-10HouseAdopted, House
2018-04-02HouseHouse Calendar Number 108
2018-04-02HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-04-02HousePublic Hearing 03/29

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback