CT HJ00142 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Michael A. Caron Of West Hartford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Public Utility Regulatory Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Michael A. Caron Of West Hartford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Public Utility Regulatory Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 68 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 262 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 50 |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-26 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |