CT HJ00137 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-29 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Soline Oslena Of Oakdale To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Soline Oslena Of Oakdale To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-04-29 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2022-04-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 361 |
2022-04-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-04-06 | House | House Calendar Number 258 |
2022-04-06 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-06 | House | Public Hearing 04/05 |