CT HJ00121 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Dismiss The Claim Against The State Of Isabel Rock Russack, Successor Administrator, D.b.n. C.t.a., Of The Estate Of James Stoll Rock And Authorizing The Claimant To Sue The State.
Title
Resolution Vacating The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Dismiss The Claim Against The State Of Isabel Rock Russack, Successor Administrator, D.b.n. C.t.a., Of The Estate Of James Stoll Rock And Authorizing The Claimant To Sue The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 337 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 73 (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 467 |
2016-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-04-14 | House | File Number 621 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Calendar Number 387 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2016-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |