CT HJ00113 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Eric J. George Of Glastonbury To Be A Member Of The Criminal Justice Commission.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Eric J. George Of Glastonbury To Be A Member Of The Criminal Justice Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 210 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 149 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-05-25 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate Calendar Number 467 |
2017-05-18 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-05-16 | House | Adopted, House |
2017-05-10 | House | House Calendar Number 504 |
2017-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-10 | House | Public Hearing 05/09 |