CT HJ00111 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Richard H. Kosinski, Esquire Of Oxford To Be A Member Of The State Department Of Education Arbitration Panel.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Richard H. Kosinski, Esquire Of Oxford To Be A Member Of The State Department Of Education Arbitration Panel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 106 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-03-17 | House | House Calendar Number 57 |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-17 | House | Public Hearing 03/15 |