CT HJ00094 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - Senate Calendar Number 551
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Commemorating The Twenty-third Anniversary Of The Connecticut-taiwan Sister-state Relationship.
Title
Resolution Commemorating The Twenty-third Anniversary Of The Connecticut-taiwan Sister-state Relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 551 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2022-05-02 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-04-13 | House | File Number 464 |
2022-04-13 | House | House Calendar Number 344 |
2022-04-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |