CT HJ00092 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - File Number 172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Recognizing Chief Harold Tantaquidgeon.
Title
Resolution Recognizing Chief Harold Tantaquidgeon.
Sponsors
House Veterans' Affairs Committee | Rep. Patrick Boyd [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] |
Rep. Kevin Ryan [D] | Rep. Brian Smith [D] | Rep. Emmett Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | File Number 172 |
2022-03-29 | House | House Calendar Number 164 |
2022-03-29 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |