CT HJ00072 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable J. Lawrence Price Of Avon To Be A Family Support Magistrate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable J. Lawrence Price Of Avon To Be A Family Support Magistrate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 35 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-03-27HouseAdopted, Senate
2019-03-15HouseSenate Calendar Number 58
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-13HouseAdopted, House
2019-02-27HouseHouse Calendar Number 18
2019-02-27HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing 02/25

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback