CT HJ00070 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Senate Calendar Number 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Alexandra D. Dipentima Of South Kent To Be A Judge Of The Appellate Court And A Judge Of The Superior Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Alexandra D. Dipentima Of South Kent To Be A Judge Of The Appellate Court And A Judge Of The Superior Court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 15 (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseSenate Calendar Number 56
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-03-13HouseAdopted, House
2019-02-27HouseHouse Calendar Number 16
2019-02-27HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing 02/25

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback