CT HJ00059 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving An Amendment To The State Constitution To Allow For Early Voting.
Title
Resolution Approving An Amendment To The State Constitution To Allow For Early Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 283 (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 284 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 87 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 3 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 5 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 284 (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 87 (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet-B (Y: 3 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 5 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-05-27 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-05-27 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Not Properly Before the Senate, Senate Amendment Schedule A 9505 |
2021-05-10 | House | Senate Calendar Number 417 |
2021-05-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Adopted, House |
2021-03-22 | House | File Number 97 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Calendar Number 104 |
2021-03-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 10:00 AM |
2021-03-08 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-05 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |