CT HJ00057 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish Seaview Village in Bridgeport as a Municipal Energy Savings Area.
Title
Resolution Establishing Seaview Village In Bridgeport As A Municipal Energy Savings Area.
Sponsors
House Energy and Technology Committee | Rep. Christopher Rosario [D] | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 431 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 29 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 29 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Senate Calendar Number 381 |
2019-04-22 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-03-28 | House | File Number 206 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 156 |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-15 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2019-03-12 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |