CT HJ00054 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 661
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

No statement of purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Commemorating The Twentieth Anniversary Of The Connecticut-taiwan Sister State Relationship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03SenateSenate Calendar Number 661
2019-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-06-03SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2019-06-03HouseAdopted, House
2019-03-19HouseFile Number 75
2019-03-19HouseHouse Calendar Number 68
2019-03-19HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-03-19HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-07HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-06HouseJoint Favorable
2019-02-11HousePublic Hearing 02/15
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2019-02-06HouseVote to Draft
2019-02-06HouseDrafted by Committee
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback