CT HJ00053 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To approve the Long Island Sound Blue Plan.
Title
Resolution Proposing The Adoption Of The Long Island Sound Blue Plan.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. Joseph Gresko [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Laura Devlin [R] |
Rep. Mary Mushinsky [D] | Rep. Kathy Kennedy [R] | Rep. Terrie Wood [R] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 44 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-05-14 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 361 |
2021-04-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | House | Adopted, House |
2021-03-23 | House | File Number 105 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Calendar Number 115 |
2021-03-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-02-26 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |