CT HJ00037 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Vacating Decisions Of The Claims Commissioner Involving Claims Against The State Of Certain Claimants And Remanding Those Claims To The Claims Commissioner For Further Proceedings.
Title
Resolution Vacating Decisions Of The Claims Commissioner Involving Claims Against The State Of Certain Claimants And Remanding Those Claims To The Claims Commissioner For Further Proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 340 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 133 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 133 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2022-05-03 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2022-04-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 543 |
2022-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-28 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-04-21 | House | File Number 575 |
2022-04-21 | House | House Calendar Number 435 |
2022-04-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-07 | House | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |