CT HJ00034 | 2023 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution Concerning Certain Witchcraft Convictions In Colonial Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Concerning Certain Witchcraft Convictions In Colonial Connecticut.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 263 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 94 AS AMENDED (Y: 121 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-25HouseIn Concurrence
2023-05-25SenateAdopted, Senate as Amended by House A
2023-05-12SenateFile Number 782
2023-05-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 507
2023-05-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2023-05-10HouseAdopted, House as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2023-05-10HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7682
2023-04-12HouseFile Number 548
2023-04-12HouseHouse Calendar Number 343
2023-04-12HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2023-04-12HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-04-04HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
2023-03-28HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2023-03-27HouseJoint Favorable
2023-02-24HousePublic Hearing 03/01
2023-02-06HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=HJ00034&which_year=2023
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/H/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R00-HB.PDF
Texthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TOB/H/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R01-HB.PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/amd/H/pdf/2023HJ-00034-R00HA-AMD.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R000548-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R000548-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/fna/pdf/2023HJ-00034-R00LCO07682-FNA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R01-BA.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/FN/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R010782-FN.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/BA/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R010782-BA.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/TS/H/PDF/2023HJ-00034-R00JUD-CV61-TS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/H/PDF/2023HV-00094-R00HJ00034-HV.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.cga.ct.gov/2023/VOTE/S/PDF/2023SV-00263-R00HJ00034-SV.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback