CT HJ00032 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-08 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Peter W. Lisi Of West Hartford As Chairperson Of The State Of Connecticut Health And Educational Facilities Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Peter W. Lisi Of West Hartford As Chairperson Of The State Of Connecticut Health And Educational Facilities Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 42 PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-02-08SenateAdopted, Senate
2017-02-02SenateSenate Calendar Number 36
2017-02-02SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-02-01SenateRules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
2017-02-01HouseAdopted, House
2017-01-18HouseHouse Calendar Number 15
2017-01-18HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing 01/17

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback