CT HJ00025 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Andrew J. Mcdonald Of Stamford To Be Chief Justice Of The Supreme Court And A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Andrew J. Mcdonald Of Stamford To Be Chief Justice Of The Supreme Court And A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Rep. William Tong [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 10 ADOPT (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 10 MOTION TO REJECT (Y: 79 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 11 (Y: 75 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 10 MOTION TO REJECT (Y: 79 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 11 (Y: 75 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Senate Rejected |
2018-03-27 | House | Unfavorable Report, Rejected by the Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 43 |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report, Rejected by the House |
2018-03-01 | House | House Calendar Number 28 |
2018-03-01 | House | Unfavorable Rpt. Tabled For House Calender |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |