CT HJ00025 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Recognizing Blue Water Navy Veterans.
Title
Resolution Recognizing Blue Water Navy Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 368 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 368 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Senate Calendar Number 397 |
2016-04-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-03-21 | House | File Number 77 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 94 |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | House | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |