CT HJ00024 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Kevin Tierney Of Greenwich To Be A State Referee.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Kevin Tierney Of Greenwich To Be A State Referee.
Sponsors
Rep. William Tong [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 9 ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 7 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Roll Call Vote 7 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-03-21 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 47 |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-03-01 | House | House Calendar Number 27 |
2018-03-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |