CT HJ00022 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Lisa Slinsky Of Waterbury To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Lisa Slinsky Of Waterbury To Be A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 48 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-04-11 | House | Adopted, Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Senate Calendar Number 49 |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-03-01 | House | House Calendar Number 25 |
2018-03-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |