CT HJ00015 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Stuart Bear Of West Hartford To Be A State Referee.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Stuart Bear Of West Hartford To Be A State Referee.
Sponsors
Rep. William Tong [D] | Sen. Paul Doyle [D] | Sen. John Kissel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 62 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 64 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 18 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 254 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2018-04-10 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-03-01 | House | House Calendar Number 18 |
2018-03-01 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 02/27 |