CT HJ00003 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Andrew J. Mcdonald Of Hartford To Be An Associate Judge Of The Supreme Court And A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Andrew J. Mcdonald Of Hartford To Be An Associate Judge Of The Supreme Court And A Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 1 ADOPT (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 2 (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 2 (Y: 104 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-01-15 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 1 |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-01-14 | House | Adopted, House |
2021-01-14 | House | Rules Suspended |
2021-01-13 | House | House Calendar Number 1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-01-13 | House | Public Hearing 01/13 |