CT HJ00001 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Approving A State Constitutional Amendment To Allow No-excuse Absentee Voting.
Title
Resolution Approving A State Constitutional Amendment To Allow No-excuse Absentee Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 274 (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - House - House Roll Call Vote 97 (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-05-30 | House | In Concurrence |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 506 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-10 | House | Adopted, House |
2023-03-28 | House | File Number 288 |
2023-03-28 | House | House Calendar Number 197 |
2023-03-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | House | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-17 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2023-02-15 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-06 | House | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |