CT HB07417 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-03 - Senate Calendar Number 669
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To convey a parcel of state land in the city of Waterbury for a community garden.
Title
An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of A Parcel Of State Land In The City Of Waterbury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 271 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 669 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-01 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2019-06-01 | House | House Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | File Number 943 |
2019-05-21 | House | House Calendar Number 624 |
2019-05-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/20/19 5:00 PM |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-25 | House | Public Hearing 04/29 |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |