CT HB07401 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - File Number 1017
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - File Number 1017
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study existing victim services and provide for recommendations to improve such services.
Title
An Act Concerning The Unauthorized Dissemination Of An Image Of A Dead Body By A State Or Municipal Employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 217 AS AMENDED (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | House | File Number 1017 |
2019-05-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Calendar Number 636 |
2019-05-28 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-28 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9545 |
2019-04-17 | House | File Number 707 |
2019-04-17 | House | House Calendar Number 443 |
2019-04-17 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |