CT HB07397 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 791
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - File Number 791
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study the criminal procedure laws of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Laws Of Criminal Procedure Of This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | File Number 791 |
2019-04-25 | House | House Calendar Number 499 |
2019-04-25 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing 04/01 |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |