CT HB07394 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure the confidentiality of certain communications that take place between a first responder and a peer support team member.
Title
An Act Concerning The Protection Of Confidential Communications Between A First Responder And A Peer Support Team Member.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 409 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-188 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | File Number 985 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Calendar Number 592 |
2019-05-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-21 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9135 |
2019-04-30 | House | File Number 850 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Calendar Number 533 |
2019-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | Public Hearing 04/03 |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |