CT HB07394 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure the confidentiality of certain communications that take place between a first responder and a peer support team member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Protection Of Confidential Communications Between A First Responder And A Peer Support Team Member.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 409 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 172 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-28HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-25HousePublic Act 19-188
2019-06-05HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-05HouseSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05HouseSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-23HouseFile Number 985
2019-05-23HouseSenate Calendar Number 592
2019-05-23HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-21HouseHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2019-05-21HouseHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9135
2019-04-30HouseFile Number 850
2019-04-30HouseHouse Calendar Number 533
2019-04-30HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-30HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-04-10HouseJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-29HousePublic Hearing 04/03
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback