CT HB07389 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To preserve confidentiality in a juvenile's case transferred under the discretion of the court to the regular criminal docket in the event that such case may be transferred back to the docket for juvenile matters and to implement the recommendations of the Juvenile Justice Policy and Oversight Committee.
Title
An Act Concerning Confidentiality In The Case Of A Discretionary Transfer Of A Juvenile's Case To The Regular Criminal Docket And Implementing The Recommendations Of The Juvenile Justice Policy And Oversight Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 170 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Roll Call Vote 170 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-25 | House | Public Act 19-187 |
2019-06-05 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-23 | House | File Number 984 |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate Calendar Number 589 |
2019-05-23 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-21 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9228 |
2019-05-15 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-15 | House | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | House | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-10 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-04-30 | House | File Number 849 |
2019-04-30 | House | House Calendar Number 532 |
2019-04-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-12 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-21 | House | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |