CT HB07378 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To increase the penalties associated with negligent homicide with a motor vehicle and illegal racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Negligent Homicide With A Motor Vehicle And Illegal Racing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 327 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 87 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-13HousePublic Act 19-53
2019-06-04HouseOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2019-06-04HouseSenate Passed
2019-05-10HouseSenate Calendar Number 479
2019-05-10HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-05-08HouseHouse Passed
2019-04-25HouseFile Number 789
2019-04-25HouseHouse Calendar Number 497
2019-04-25HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25HouseReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-18HouseReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-11HouseFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-09HouseJoint Favorable
2019-03-21HousePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback